WA SB6473 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning asbestos-containing building materials.
Title
Concerning asbestos-containing building materials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Chapter 100, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 42; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2020-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Committee amendment |
2020-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-25 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-02-14 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |