WA SB6472 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Standardizing definitions of homelessness to improve access to services.
Title
Standardizing definitions of homelessness to improve access to services.
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2388 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.