WA SB6471 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Developing model policies to create workplaces that are safe from sexual harassment.
Title
Developing model policies to create workplaces that are safe from sexual harassment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Chapter 121, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2018-02-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | House | Floor amendment |
2018-02-22 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-20 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-12 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |