WA SB6471 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding the energy facility site evaluation council.
Title
Regarding the energy facility site evaluation council.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Fraser [D] | Sen. Daniel Kline [D] | Sen. Christopher Marr [D] | Sen. Craig Pridemore [D] |
Sen. Phillips Rockefeller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-02-12 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-03 | EWE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-02 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment and Water & Energy at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-19 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment and Water & Energy at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-14 | First reading, referred to Environment, Water & Energy. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2527 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-22 - Effective date 6/10/2010.