WA SB6468 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Returned to Rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Returned to Rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding community-based behavioral health facilities through issuance of state bonds.
Title
Expanding community-based behavioral health facilities through issuance of state bonds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Returned to Rules. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |