WA SB6457 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting actions against real estate appraisers.
Title
Limiting actions against real estate appraisers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2629 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-11 - First reading, referred to Judiciary