WA SB6456 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning requirements before issuance of an initial vehicle registration.
Title
Concerning requirements before issuance of an initial vehicle registration.
Sponsors
Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2741 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-02 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6456&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6456.pdf |