WA SB6452 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding the activities of the children's mental health services consultation program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding the activities of the children's mental health services consultation program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateEffective date 6/7/2018.
2018-03-27SenateChapter 288, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-27SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-09SenateDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-08HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-08SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-06SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2018-03-06SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2018-03-01HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2018-03-01HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-03-01HouseCommittee amendment
2018-03-01HouseCommittee amendment not adopted.
2018-02-28HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-26HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-26HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2018-02-26HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM.
2018-02-23HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2018-02-21HouseELHS - Majority; do pass with amendment
2018-02-21HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM.
2018-02-13HouseFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services
2018-02-10SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2018-02-10SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-10Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2018-02-08SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-06SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-06SenateWM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-02-06SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2018-01-31SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-25SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2018-01-24SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2018-01-24SenateHSC - Majority; do pass.
2018-01-24SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-17SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-17SenateFirst reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback