WA SB6449 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Promoting renewable natural gas.
Title
Promoting renewable natural gas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | EENT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Technology. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2580 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-22 - Effective date 7/1/2018.