WA SB6440 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing public health threats that particularly impact highly exposed populations, including children and firefighters, by establishing a process for the department of health to restrict the use of toxic flame retardant chemicals in certain types of consumer products.
Title
Reducing public health threats that particularly impact highly exposed populations, including children and firefighters, by establishing a process for the department of health to restrict the use of toxic flame retardant chemicals in certain types of consumer products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2545 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.