WA SB6439 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education & Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education & Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing sexual misconduct at postsecondary educational institutions.
Title
Addressing sexual misconduct at postsecondary educational institutions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2327 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-03 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6439&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6439.pdf |