WA SB6438 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning improvements to tax and licensing laws administered by the department of revenue.
Title
Concerning improvements to tax and licensing laws administered by the department of revenue.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2016-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |