WA SB6437 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Effective date 5/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Effective date 5/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the disposal of recreational vehicles abandoned on public property.
Title
Addressing the disposal of recreational vehicles abandoned on public property.
Sponsors
Sen. Curtis King [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 76 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 76 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Effective date 5/1/2019. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Chapter 287, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 46; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2018-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 76; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-02 | House | Floor amendment |
2018-03-02 | House | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2018-02-28 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-26 | House | TR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-21 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-02-13 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
2018-02-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2018-02-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-10 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2925 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.