WA SB6430 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Vetoed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a statewide industrial waste coordination program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a statewide industrial waste coordination program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-06 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-03SenateGovernor vetoed.
2020-03-11SenateDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-10HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-09SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-06HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-03-06HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-04HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-03-03HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-03-02HouseAPP - Majority; do pass.
2020-03-02HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-28HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2020-02-27HouseENVI - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-27HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-25HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM.
2020-02-24HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-19HouseFirst reading, referred to Environment & Energy.
2020-02-17SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-02-17SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-13SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-02-11SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-11SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-11SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-10SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-01-31SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-01-30SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-01-30SenateENET - Majority; do pass.
2020-01-30SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2020-01-22SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-16SenateFirst reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback