WA SB6430 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning ballot envelopes.
Title
Concerning ballot envelopes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-03-05 | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-05 | Placed on second reading. | |
2010-03-05 | Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2010-02-23 | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-16 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. | |
2010-02-15 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2010-02-15 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-02 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-01-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-25 | GO - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-01-21 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-14 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. |