WA SB6426 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminating certain boards and commissions.
Title
Eliminating certain boards and commissions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-02-23 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-18 | SGTA - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-18 | SGTA - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-18 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-12 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. | |
2010-02-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2010-02-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-10 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-10 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-09 | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-09 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-08 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-14 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2617 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-29 - Effective date 6/10/2010*.