WA SB6416 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing telehealth services to schools.
Title
Providing telehealth services to schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Annette Cleveland [D] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Emily Randall [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2562 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-15 - First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6416&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6416.pdf |