WA SB6415 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning consecutive sentences for driving under the influence or physical control of a vehicle under the influence of intoxicating liquor, marijuana, or any drug.
Title
Concerning consecutive sentences for driving under the influence or physical control of a vehicle under the influence of intoxicating liquor, marijuana, or any drug.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. Jan Angel [R] | Sen. Rodney Tom [D] | Sen. Bruce Dammeier [R] |
Sen. Andy Hill [R] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Tracey Eide [D] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] |
Sen. Curtis King [R] | Rep. Lisa Brown [D] | Sen. Barbara Bailey [R] | Sen. Stephen Litzow [R] |
Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] | Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Senate | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Chapter 101, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2014-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-07 | House | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2014-03-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-03-03 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-27 | House | APPG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-02-27 | House | APPG - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-27 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government & Information Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government & Information Technology. |
2014-02-25 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-25 | House | PS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-19 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 5:30 PM. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |