WA SB6414 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying sex offender registration provisions.
Title
Modifying sex offender registration provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-31 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-31 | Chapter 267, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-31 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-04 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-03 | President signed. | |
2010-03-02 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-02 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-01 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-03-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-27 | WAYS - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-27 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-27 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. | |
2010-02-24 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-22 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-22 | HS - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-22 | HS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-22 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-18 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-15 | First reading, referred to Human Services. | |
2010-02-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-02-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-13 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-10 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-04 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-04 | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-02 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-19 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-14 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |