WA SB6400 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Mitigating inequity in the health insurance market caused by health plans that exclude certain mandated benefits.
Title
Mitigating inequity in the health insurance market caused by health plans that exclude certain mandated benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2554 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.