WA SB6392 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-30 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-30 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the use of revenue generated from tolling the state route number 520 corridor.
Title
Clarifying the use of revenue generated from tolling the state route number 520 corridor.
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Haugen [D] | Sen. Janea Holmquist [R] | Sen. Ken Jacobsen [D] | Sen. Christopher Marr [D] |
Sen. Eric Oemig [D] | Sen. Daniel Swecker [R] | Sen. Rodney Tom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-30 | Chapter 248, 2010 Laws PV. | |
2010-03-30 | Governor partially vetoed. | |
2010-03-10 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-09 | President signed. | |
2010-03-08 | Passed final passage; yeas, 37; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-08 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2010-03-02 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 78; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-02 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-02 | Committee amendment adopted as amended. | |
2010-03-01 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-28 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-24 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-24 | TR - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-24 | TR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-24 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-22 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-17 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2010-02-16 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-16 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-16 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-16 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-13 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-27 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-27 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-01-27 | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-21 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-13 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2929 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.