WA SB6383 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the retirement strategy funds in the plan 3 and the deferred compensation programs.
Title
Concerning the retirement strategy funds in the plan 3 and the deferred compensation programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Chapter 160, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-16 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2341 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.