WA SB6379 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing automatic voter registration at qualified voter registration agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing automatic voter registration at qualified voter registration agencies.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-10SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2016-02-04SenateExecutive action scheduled, but the motion to report the bill out of the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 5:45 PM failed.
2016-01-25SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM.
2016-01-18SenateFirst reading, referred to Government Operations & Security.

Same As/Similar To

HB2682 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback