WA SB6379 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - Effective date 7/1/2011*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - Effective date 7/1/2011*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Streamlining and making technical corrections to vehicle and vessel registration and title provisions.
Title
Streamlining and making technical corrections to vehicle and vessel registration and title provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Berkey [D] | Sen. Brian Hatfield [D] | Sen. Mary Haugen [D] | Sen. Claudia Kauffman [D] |
Sen. Christopher Marr [D] | Sen. Kevin Ranker [D] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] | Sen. Daniel Swecker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | Effective date 7/1/2011*. | |
2010-03-22 | Chapter 161, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-22 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-08 | President signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-06 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2010-03-02 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-02 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-02 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2010-03-01 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-28 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-24 | TR - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-24 | TR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-24 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-22 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-13 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2010-02-12 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-02-12 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-03 | TRAN - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-01 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-19 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-13 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |