WA SB6377 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the definition of veteran.
Title
Addressing the definition of veteran.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2701 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-13 - Effective date 6/7/2018.