WA SB6373 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning hours of availability for inspection and copying of public records.
Title
Concerning hours of availability for inspection and copying of public records.
Sponsors
Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] |
Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] | Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6373&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6373.pdf |