WA SB6371 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning facilities financing by the housing finance commission.
Title
Concerning facilities financing by the housing finance commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Mullet [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Chapter 78, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-02-28 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 59; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-28 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-26 | House | CB - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. |
2018-02-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 3:30 PM. |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred to Capital Budget. |
2018-02-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-20 | House | CDHT - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-20 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-13 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 2; absent, 1; excused, 2. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | FI - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 8:30 AM. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 8:30 AM. |
2018-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2364 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.