WA SB6370 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning individuals under the department of corrections' jurisdiction.
Title
Concerning individuals under the department of corrections' jurisdiction.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Mike Padden [R] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] |
Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-03-02 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-03-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-25 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-25 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |