WA SB6369 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning individuals serving community custody terms.
Title
Concerning individuals serving community custody terms.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] |
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2417 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-19 - Effective date 6/11/2020.