WA SB6367 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning publicly owned industrial wastewater treatment facilities.
Title
Concerning publicly owned industrial wastewater treatment facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Chapter 152, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-26 | House | CB - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. |
2018-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 3:30 PM. |
2018-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | EENT - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Technology. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2838 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.