WA SB6366 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning permits for certain major transportation corridor projects.
Title
Concerning permits for certain major transportation corridor projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-03 | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-01 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-19 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-13 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |