WA SB6363 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the design and construction of certain transportation facilities adjacent to or across a river or waterway.
Title
Concerning the design and construction of certain transportation facilities adjacent to or across a river or waterway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-25 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Chapter 34, 2016 Laws. |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-29 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-29 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2016-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2016-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2660 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.