WA SB6359 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating regulation exemptions for rural health clinics providing services in a designated home health shortage area.
Title
Creating regulation exemptions for rural health clinics providing services in a designated home health shortage area.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-31 | Senate | Chapter 258, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-31 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2020-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee amendment |
2020-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-27 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-27 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing scheduled, but not heard in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2621 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.