WA SB6353 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - First reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology
Pending: House State Government, Elections & Information Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning procedures in order to automatically register citizens to vote.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning procedures in order to automatically register citizens to vote.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology
2018-02-10SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 34; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2018-02-10SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-10SenateFloor amendment
2018-02-10Senate3rd substitute bill substituted
2018-02-07SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-06SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-06SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-06SenateTRAN - Majority; 3rd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-02-06SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-05SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-02SenateReferred to Transportation.
2018-02-01SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-01SenateMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-01SenateAnd refer to Transportation.
2018-02-01SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-02-01SenatePublic hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2018-02-01SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2018-01-31SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-01-31SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2018-01-31SenateSGTE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-31SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-19SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-17SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-12SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.

Same As/Similar To

HB2595 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-21 - Scheduled for public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM in anticipation of other legislative action.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback