WA SB6346 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on March 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-19 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on March 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-19 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the use of certain electric vehicles.
Title
Expanding the use of certain electric vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-19 | Chapter 144, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-19 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-08 | President signed. | |
2010-03-07 | Passed final passage; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-03-07 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2010-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2010-03-01 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-28 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-24 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-24 | TR - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-24 | TR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-24 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-17 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-12 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2010-02-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-10 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-28 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-01-27 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-27 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-01-27 | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-20 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-12 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3079 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.