WA SB6342 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning chemical contaminants in drinking water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning chemical contaminants in drinking water.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseReturned to Senate Rules 3.
2020-02-28HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2020-02-27HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-27HouseENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-27HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-24HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-18HouseFirst reading, referred to Environment & Energy.
2020-02-17SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 32; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-02-17SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-17Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2020-02-13SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-02-11SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-10SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-10SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-10SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-10SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-06SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2020-01-31SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-01-30SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-01-30SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-01-30SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-01-30SenateENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-01-30SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2020-01-15SenateFirst reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback