WA SB6340 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-19 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-19 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the membership of the Washington state forensic investigations council.
Title
Changing the membership of the Washington state forensic investigations council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-19 | Chapter 143, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-19 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-09 | President signed. | |
2010-03-08 | Passed final passage; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-08 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2010-02-28 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-28 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-28 | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. | |
2010-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-23 | PSEP - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-23 | PSEP - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-23 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-17 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-12 | First reading, referred to Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness. | |
2010-02-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-02-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-10 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-28 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-01-27 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-27 | JUD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-26 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-22 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-12 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2767 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.