WA SB6332 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-19 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-19 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning human trafficking.
Title
Concerning human trafficking.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerome Delvin [R] | Sen. Darlene Fairley [D] | Sen. Karen Fraser [D] | Sen. Mary Haugen [D] |
Sen. Daniel Kline [D] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. Pamela Roach [R] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] |
Sen. Val Stevens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-19 | Chapter 142, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-19 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-09 | President signed. | |
2010-03-08 | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-08 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2010-02-28 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-28 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-28 | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. | |
2010-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-23 | CL - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-23 | CL - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-23 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-19 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-16 | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. | |
2010-02-15 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 4. | |
2010-02-15 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-15 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-02 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-01-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-25 | LCCP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-21 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-19 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-12 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. |