WA SB6329 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-19 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-19 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a beer and wine tasting endorsement to the grocery store liquor license.
Title
Creating a beer and wine tasting endorsement to the grocery store liquor license.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerome Delvin [R] | Sen. Rosa Franklin [D] | Sen. Michael Hewitt [R] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Daniel Kline [D] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-19 | Chapter 141, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-19 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-05 | President signed. | |
2010-03-04 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 77; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2010-03-04 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-23 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-23 | CL - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-23 | CL - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-23 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-15 | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. | |
2010-02-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-02-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-13 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-28 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-01-19 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-19 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-01-19 | LCCP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-18 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-14 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-12 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2688 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.