WA SB6328 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning deferred compensation plans.
Title
Concerning deferred compensation plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Senate | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Chapter 172, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-03-03 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-27 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-27 | House | APP - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-20 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |