WA SB6325 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Correcting the expiration date of a definition of firefighter.
Title
Correcting the expiration date of a definition of firefighter.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2456 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-28 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6325&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6325.pdf |