WA SB6324 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning special purpose district financial reporting.
Title
Concerning special purpose district financial reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-02-14 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |