WA SB6319 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Implementing the federal produce safety rule.
Title
Implementing the federal produce safety rule.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Chapter 106, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-02-28 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-28 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-21 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-15 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2681 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.