WA SB6314 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting taxpayers from home foreclosure.
Title
Protecting taxpayers from home foreclosure.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Holy [R] | Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] |
Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2526 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-31 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM.