WA SB6309 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Effective date 7/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Extending the timeline for completing a family assessment response.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extending the timeline for completing a family assessment response.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15SenateEffective date 7/1/2018.
2018-03-15SenateChapter 77, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-15SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-06SenateDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-03SenatePresident signed.
2018-02-28HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-02-28HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-28HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-26HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-26HouseAPP - Majority; do pass.
2018-02-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM.
2018-02-24HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-23HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2018-02-21HouseELHS - Majority; do pass.
2018-02-21HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM.
2018-02-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services
2018-02-12SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2018-02-12SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-12Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2018-02-08SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-06SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-06SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-06SenateWM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-02-06SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-05SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2018-01-25SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2018-01-24SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2018-01-24SenateHSC - Majority; do pass.
2018-01-24SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-22SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-11SenateFirst reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections.

Same As/Similar To

HB2449 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback