WA SB6308 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Controlling computer access by residents of the special commitment center.
Title
Controlling computer access by residents of the special commitment center.
Sponsors
Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Michael Carrell [R] | Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Christopher Marr [D] |
Sen. Pamela Roach [R] | Sen. Val Stevens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-25 | Chapter 218, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-25 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-11 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-09 | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-09 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2010-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2010-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-05 | Floor amendment | |
2010-03-05 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-23 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-23 | PSEP - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-23 | PSEP - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-23 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-17 | First reading, referred to Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness. | |
2010-02-16 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-16 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-05 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-04 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-04 | HSC - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-02 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-28 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-12 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3114 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.