WA SB6283 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the practice of a phlebotomist.
Title
Clarifying the practice of a phlebotomist.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | Senate | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Chapter 138, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2014-03-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-13 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-03-13 | House | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules suspended. |
2014-03-13 | House | House receded from amendments. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Vote on final passage will be considered. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Notice given to reconsider vote on final passage. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2014-03-12 | House | House insists on its position and asks Senate to concur. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. |
2014-03-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-03-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-10 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-03-10 | House | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2014-03-10 | House | Rules suspended. |
2014-03-10 | House | House receded from amendments. |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. |
2014-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-05 | House | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2014-03-03 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-02-26 | House | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-20 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2532 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-20 - First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness