WA SB6273 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective date 10/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective date 10/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning state charity care law.
Title
Concerning state charity care law.
Sponsors
Sen. Annette Cleveland [D] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] |
Sen. Guy Palumbo [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Senate | Effective date 10/1/2018. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Chapter 263, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2018-02-28 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-28 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee amendment |
2018-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-23 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-23 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |