WA SB6272 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Environment, Energy & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Environment, Energy & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending state greenhouse gas emission limits for consistency with the most recent assessment of climate change science.
Title
Amending state greenhouse gas emission limits for consistency with the most recent assessment of climate change science.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2311 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-19 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6272&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6272.pdf |