WA SB6264 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulating contracts by institutions of higher education with private entities.
Title
Regulating contracts by institutions of higher education with private entities.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Ranker [D] | Sen. Guy Palumbo [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-22 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-15 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | HEWD - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |